List of Air Chief Marshal of India
The below table is the list of Air Chief Marshal of India.
List of Air Chief Marshals of India |
||
---|---|---|
Name | Rank | Tenure |
Sir Thomas Elmhirst | Air Marshal | 15 August 1947 β 23 February 1950 |
Sir Ronald Ivelaw-Chapman | Air Chief Marshal | 23 February 1950 β 9 December 1951 |
Gerald Gibbs | Air Marshal | 10 December 1951 β 31 March 1954 |
Subroto Mukerjee | Air Marshal | 1 April 1954 β 31 March 1955 |
Aspy Engineer | Air Marshal | 1 December 1960 β 31 July 1964 |
Arjan Singh | Air Chief Marshal | 1 August 1964 β 15 July 1969 |
Pratap Chandra Lal | Air Chief Marshal | 16 July 1969 β 15 January 1973 |
Om Prakash Mehra | Air Chief Marshal | 16 January 1973 β 31 January 1976 |
Hrushikesh Moolgavkar | Air Chief Marshal | 1 February 1976 β 30 August 1978 |
Idris Hasan Latif | Air Chief Marshal | 1 September 1978 β 30 August 1981 |
Dilbagh Singh | Air Chief Marshal | 1 September 1981 β 3 September 1984 |
Lakshman Madhav Katre | Air Chief Marshal | 3 September 1984 β 1 July 1985 |
Denis La Fontaine | Air Chief Marshal | 3 July 1985 β 31 July 1988 |
Surinder Mehra | Air Chief Marshal | 1 August 1988 β 31 July 1991 |
Nirmal Chandra Suri | Air Chief Marshal | 31 July 1991 β 31 July 1993 |
Swaroop Krishna Kaul | Air Chief Marshal | 1 August 1993 β 31 December 1995 |
Satish Sareen | Air Chief Marshal | 31 December 1995 β 31 December 1998 |
Anil Yashwant Tipnis | Air Chief Marshal | 31 December 1998 β 31 December 2001 |
Srinivasapuram Krishnaswamy | Air Chief Marshal | 31 December 2001 β 31 December 2004 |
Shashindra Pal Tyagi | Air Chief Marshal | 31 December 2004 β 31 March 2007 |
Fali Homi Major | Air Chief Marshal | 31 March 2007 β 31 May 2009 |
Pradeep Vasant Naik | Air Chief Marshal | 31 May 2009 β 31 July 2011 |
Norman Anil Kumar Browne | Air Chief Marshal | 31 July 2011 β 31 December 2013 |
Arup Raha | Air Chief Marshal | 31 December 2013 β 31 December 2016 |
Birender Singh Dhanoa | Air Chief Marshal | 31 December 2016 β 30 September 2019 |
Rakesh Kumar Singh Bhadauria | Air Chief Marshal | 30 September 2019 β Incumbent |
List of Air Chief Marshal of India (1947-2024)
Air Chief Marshal of India: Vivek Ram Chaudhari is the current air chief marshal of India. He took the oath as 27th Air Chief Marshal on 30 September 2021. Indian Air Force is the fourth largest air force globally and was founded on October 8, 1932.
Its main job is to protect the sky above India and to fight in the air during wars. The Chief of Air Staff is the top position in the Indian Air Force. Check the list of air chief marshals of India from the below table.
The βChief of Air Marshalβ was designated as Chief of Air Staff till 1966. The most important rank in the Indian Air Force is βMarshal of the Air Force,β and the President of India gives this title only in special situations. This is an important topic for UPSC and is also relevant for other government exams.
Table of Content
- List of Air Chief Marshal of India
- First Air Chief Marshals of India
- Current Air Chief Marshals of India
- Facts About Air Chief Marshal of India