List of Chief Ministers of Gujarat (1960-2023)
Below is the updated list of Chief Ministers of Gujarat from 1960 to 2023:
Chief Ministers of Gujarat From 1960 to 2023 List |
|||
---|---|---|---|
S.No | Chief Minister | From | To |
1 | Bhupendrabhai Patel | 13 Sep 2021 | Present |
2 | Vijay Rupani | 26 Dec 2017 | 13 Sep 2021 |
3 | Vijay Rupani | 07 Aug 2016 | 26 Dec 2017 |
4 | Anandiben Patel | 22 May 2014 | 07 Aug 2016 |
5 | Narendra Modi | 20 Dec 2012 | 22 May 2014 |
6 | Narendra Modi | 23 Dec 2007 | 20 Dec 2012 |
7 | Narendra Modi | 22 Dec 2002 | 22 Dec 2007 |
8 | Narendra Modi | 07 Oct 2001 | 22 Dec 2002 |
9 | Keshubhai Patel | 04 Mar 1998 | 06 Oct 2001 |
10 | Dilip Parikh | 28 Oct 1997 | 04 Mar 1998 |
11 | Shankersinh Vaghela | 23 Oct 1996 | 27 Oct 1997 |
12 | President’s rule | 19 Sep 1996 | 23 Oct 1996 |
13 | Suresh Mehta | 21 Oct 1995 | 19 Sep 1996 |
14 | Keshubhai Patel | 14 Mar 1995 | 21 Oct 1995 |
15 | Chhabildas Mehta | 17 Feb 1994 | 13 Mar 1995 |
16 | Chimanbhai Patel | 25 Oct 1990 | 17 Feb 1994 |
17 | Chimanbhai Patel | 04 Mar 1990 | 25 Oct 1990 |
18 | Madhav Singh Solanki | 10 Dec 1989 | 03 Mar 1990 |
19 | Amarsinh Chaudhary | 06 Jul 1985 | 09 Dec 1989 |
20 | Madhav Singh Solanki | 11 Mar 1985 | 06 Jul 1985 |
21 | Madhav Singh Solanki | 07 Jun 1980 | 10 Mar 1985 |
22 | President’s rule | 17 Feb 1980 | 06 Jun 1980 |
23 | Babubhai J. Patel | 11 Apr 1977 | 17 Feb 1980 |
24 | Madhav Singh Solanki | 24 Dec 1976 | 10 Apr 1977 |
25 | President’s rule | 12 Mar 1976 | 24 Dec 1976 |
26 | Babubhai J. Patel | 18 Jun 1975 | 12 Mar 1976 |
27 | President’s rule | 09 Feb 1974 | 18 Jun 1975 |
28 | Chimanbhai Patel | 17 Jul 1973 | 09 Feb 1974 |
29 | Ghanshyam Oza | 17 Mar 1972 | 17 Jul 1973 |
30 | President’s rule | 13 May 1971 | 17 Mar 1972 |
31 | Hitendra Kanaiyalal | 03 Apr 1967 | 12 May 1971 |
32 | Hitendra Kanaiyalal | 19 Sep 1965 | 03 Apr 1967 |
33 | Balwantrai Mehta | 19 Sep 1963 | 19 Sep 1965 |
34 | Jivraj Narayan Mehta | 03 Mar 1962 | 19 Sep 1963 |
35 | Jivraj Narayan Mehta | 01 May 1960 | 03 Mar 1962 |
Updated List of Chief Ministers of Gujarat & Their Tenure (1960-2023)
Since its establishment in 1960, Gujarat has seen a vibrant political climate marked by a series of chief ministers. These individuals have played a crucial role in shaping governmental policy, promoting economic growth, and guiding the state’s development. Bhupendrabhai Patel is Gujarat’s current Chief Minister. On September 13, 2021, he took the oath of office as Gujarat’s 17th Chief Minister. In terms of the state’s governance and administration, the Gujarat Chief Minister is extremely important. View the Gujarat chief ministers’ list, complete with party names and terms of office.