List of UPSC Former Chairman (1926-2023)
There have been 32 UPSC Chairman to date. Ross Barker was appointed as the first Chairman of the UPSC commission and joined it in 1926. The following table below gives the complete list of the Chairmans to date.
S.No. |
Name of the chairma |
Period |
---|---|---|
1. |
Sir Ross Barker |
1926 -1932 |
2. |
Sir David Petrie |
1932-1936 |
3. |
Sir Eyre Gorden |
1937-1942 |
4. |
Sir F.W Robertson |
1942-1947 |
5. |
H.K Kripalani |
1947-1949 |
6. |
R.N Banerjee |
January 1949-May 1955 |
7. |
N.Govindarajan |
May 10,1955 9 December 9 ,1955 |
8. |
V.S Hejmadi |
December 10, 1955-December 9, 1961 |
9. |
B.N Jha |
December 11, 1961 – February 22, 1967 |
10. |
K.R Damle |
April 18, 1667- March 2, 1971 |
11. |
Randhir Chandra Sarma Sarkar |
May 1971 – February 1973 |
12. |
Akhlaqur Kidwai |
February 5,1973- February 4, 1979 |
13. |
M.L Sahare |
February 1979-February 1985 |
14. |
H.K.L Capoor |
February 18 , 1985 – March 5, 1990 |
15. |
J.P Gupta |
March 5, 1990 – June 2, 1992 |
16. |
R.M Bathew |
September, 23 1992- August 23,1996 |
17. |
S.J.S Chhatwal |
August 23,1996- September 30, 1996 |
18. |
J.M Quereshi |
September 30 1996- December 11 ,1998 |
`19. |
Surendra Nath |
December 11, 1998- June 25,2002 |
20. |
Purna Chandra Hota |
June,2002 -September, 2003 |
21. |
Mata Prasad |
September 2003-January 2005 |
22. |
S.R Hashim |
January 4, 2005- April 1, 2006 |
23. |
Gurbachan Jagat |
April 1,2006- June 30, 2007 |
24. |
Sabir Dutta |
June 30 ,2007- August 16,2008 |
25. |
D.P Agarwal |
August 16 ,2008 – August 2014 |
26. |
Rajni Rajdan |
August 16,2014 – November 21, 2014 |
27. |
Deepak Gupta |
November 22 ,2014 20 September 20,2016 |
28. |
Alka Sirohi |
January 4 ,2017-21 January |
29. |
David. R.Syiemlieh |
January 4 ,2017- January 21, 2018 |
30. |
Vinay Mittal |
January 22,2018 -June 19,2018 |
31. |
Arvind Saxena |
June 20, 2018 – August 24, 2020 |
32. |
Pradeep Kumar Joshi |
August, 2020 – April, 2022 |
33. |
Dr Manoj Soni |
May 5, 2023 |
List of UPSC Chairman 1926-2023 [Updated]
UPSC Chairman list (1926-2023): The UPSC is like a big team in India that selects officers for essential government jobs available in the Armed Forces and the Union of India cadres. The UPSC includes the Chairman and members appointed by the President of India. Manoj Soni is the latest Chairman of UPSC. He took the charge as a Chairman on May 16, 2023. He replaced Pradeep Kumar Joshi and was appointed UPSC’s new chairman. This article will let you know everything about the UPSC Chairman lists. It will also discuss the previous year’s chairman and the details of the current chairman of UPSC.
Table of Content
- The Function of UPSC Chairman
- Role of The UPSC Chairman
- List of UPSC Former Chairman (1926-2023)
- About the Current UPSC Chairman, Dr Manoj Soni
- Conclusion
- Related Articles
- Important FAQs regarding the UPSC Chairman list(1926-2023)