Solicitor General of India List
The following is a list of India’s Solicitor Generals since independence:
Solicitor General |
Term Duration |
Term Length |
Prime Minister |
---|---|---|---|
1. Chander Kishan Daphtary |
28 January 1950 – 1 March 1963 | 13 years, 32 days |
Jawaharlal Nehru |
2. H.N. Sanyal |
2 March 1963 – 9 September 1964 | 1 year, 191 days |
Jawaharlal Nehru Lal Bahadur Shastri |
3. S. V. Gupta |
10 September 1964 – 16 September 1967 | 3 years, 6 days |
Lal Bahadur Shastri Indira Gandhi |
4. Niren De |
30 September 1967 – 30 October 1968 | 1 year, 30 days |
Indira Gandhi |
5. Jagdish Swarup |
5 June 1969 – 4 June 1972 | 2 years, 365 days |
Indira Gandhi |
6. Lal Narayan Sinha |
17 July 1972 – 5 April 1977 | 4 years, 262 days |
Indira Gandhi |
7. S. N. Kacker |
5 April 1977 – 2 August 1979 | 2 years, 119 days |
Morarji Desai |
8. Soli Jehangir Sorabji |
9 August 1979 – 25 January 1980 | 169 days |
Charan Singh |
9. Keshava Parasaran |
6 March 1980 – 8 August 1983 | 3 years, 155 days |
Indira Gandhi |
10. Milon Kumar Banerji |
4 April 1986 – 3 April 1989 | 2 years, 364 days |
Rajiv Gandhi |
11. Ashok Desai |
18 December 1989 – 2 December 1990 | 349 days |
V. P. Singh |
12. A. D. Giri |
4 December 1990 – 1 December 1991 | 362 days |
Chandra Shekhar |
13. Dipankar P. Gupta |
9 April 1992 – 10 April 1997 | 5 years, 1 day |
P. V. Narsimha Rao H. D. Deve Gowda |
14. Tehmtan R. Andhyarujina | 11 April 1997 – 4 April 1998 | 358 days | Inder Kumar Gujral |
15. Nitte Santhosh Hegde | 10 April 1998 – 7 January 1999 | 272 days | Atal Bihari Vajpayee |
16. Harish Salve | 1 November 1999 – 3 November 2002 | 3 years, 2 days | Atal Bihari Vajpayee |
17. Kirit Raval | 4 November 2002 – 19 April 2004 | 1 year, 167 days | Atal Bihari Vajpayee |
18. Goolam Essaji Vahanvati |
20 June 2004 – 7 June 2009 | 4 years, 352 days | Manmohan Singh |
19. Gopal Subramaniam |
15 June 2009 – 14 July 2011 | 2 years, 29 days | Manmohan Singh |
20. Rohintan Fali Nariman |
23 July 2011 – 4 February 2013 | 1 year, 196 days | Manmohan Singh |
21. Mohan Parasaran |
15 February 2013 – 26 May 2014 | 1 year, 100 days | Manmohan Singh |
22. Ranjit Kumar |
7 June 2014 – 20 October 2017 | 3 years, 135 days | Narendra Modi |
23. Tushar Mehta |
10 October 2018 – Incumbent | 5 years, 27 days | Narendra Modi |
Solicitor General of India (UPSC Notes)
Solicitor General of India: The Solicitor General of India is the second law officer in the country, after the Attorney General of India who is the highest law officer in India. The Attorney General of India is the superior of the Solicitor General of India (SGI). In accordance with the Law Officers (Conditions of Service) Rules, 1972, the SGI and the Addl. SGIs provide advice to the Government and represent the Union of India. The positions of Solicitor General and Additional Solicitors General are purely statutory, in contrast to the Attorney General for India, which is a constitutional post as defined by Article 76 of the Indian Constitution.
In this article, you will read about the Solicitor General of India, the appointment of Solicitor General, tenure, functions, limitations, and list of Solicitor General of India.
Table of Content
- Solicitor General of India 2023
- 1st Solicitor General of India
- Appointment of Solicitor General of India
- Tenure of Solicitor General of India
- Solicitor General of India List
- Functions of Solicitor General of India
- Limitations of Solicitor General of India
- Important Facts about Solicitor General of India