Updated List of Chief Ministers of Gujarat & Their Tenure (1960-2023)
Since its establishment in 1960, Gujarat has seen a vibrant political climate marked by a series of chief ministers. These individuals have played a crucial role in shaping governmental policy, promoting economic growth, and guiding the state’s development. Bhupendrabhai Patel is Gujarat’s current Chief Minister. On September 13, 2021, he took the oath of office as Gujarat’s 17th Chief Minister. In terms of the state’s governance and administration, the Gujarat Chief Minister is extremely important. View the Gujarat chief ministers’ list, complete with party names and terms of office.
List of Chief Ministers of Gujarat (1960-2023)
Below is the updated list of Chief Ministers of Gujarat from 1960 to 2023:
Chief Ministers of Gujarat From 1960 to 2023 List |
|||
---|---|---|---|
S.No | Chief Minister | From | To |
1 | Bhupendrabhai Patel | 13 Sep 2021 | Present |
2 | Vijay Rupani | 26 Dec 2017 | 13 Sep 2021 |
3 | Vijay Rupani | 07 Aug 2016 | 26 Dec 2017 |
4 | Anandiben Patel | 22 May 2014 | 07 Aug 2016 |
5 | Narendra Modi | 20 Dec 2012 | 22 May 2014 |
6 | Narendra Modi | 23 Dec 2007 | 20 Dec 2012 |
7 | Narendra Modi | 22 Dec 2002 | 22 Dec 2007 |
8 | Narendra Modi | 07 Oct 2001 | 22 Dec 2002 |
9 | Keshubhai Patel | 04 Mar 1998 | 06 Oct 2001 |
10 | Dilip Parikh | 28 Oct 1997 | 04 Mar 1998 |
11 | Shankersinh Vaghela | 23 Oct 1996 | 27 Oct 1997 |
12 | President’s rule | 19 Sep 1996 | 23 Oct 1996 |
13 | Suresh Mehta | 21 Oct 1995 | 19 Sep 1996 |
14 | Keshubhai Patel | 14 Mar 1995 | 21 Oct 1995 |
15 | Chhabildas Mehta | 17 Feb 1994 | 13 Mar 1995 |
16 | Chimanbhai Patel | 25 Oct 1990 | 17 Feb 1994 |
17 | Chimanbhai Patel | 04 Mar 1990 | 25 Oct 1990 |
18 | Madhav Singh Solanki | 10 Dec 1989 | 03 Mar 1990 |
19 | Amarsinh Chaudhary | 06 Jul 1985 | 09 Dec 1989 |
20 | Madhav Singh Solanki | 11 Mar 1985 | 06 Jul 1985 |
21 | Madhav Singh Solanki | 07 Jun 1980 | 10 Mar 1985 |
22 | President’s rule | 17 Feb 1980 | 06 Jun 1980 |
23 | Babubhai J. Patel | 11 Apr 1977 | 17 Feb 1980 |
24 | Madhav Singh Solanki | 24 Dec 1976 | 10 Apr 1977 |
25 | President’s rule | 12 Mar 1976 | 24 Dec 1976 |
26 | Babubhai J. Patel | 18 Jun 1975 | 12 Mar 1976 |
27 | President’s rule | 09 Feb 1974 | 18 Jun 1975 |
28 | Chimanbhai Patel | 17 Jul 1973 | 09 Feb 1974 |
29 | Ghanshyam Oza | 17 Mar 1972 | 17 Jul 1973 |
30 | President’s rule | 13 May 1971 | 17 Mar 1972 |
31 | Hitendra Kanaiyalal | 03 Apr 1967 | 12 May 1971 |
32 | Hitendra Kanaiyalal | 19 Sep 1965 | 03 Apr 1967 |
33 | Balwantrai Mehta | 19 Sep 1963 | 19 Sep 1965 |
34 | Jivraj Narayan Mehta | 03 Mar 1962 | 19 Sep 1963 |
35 | Jivraj Narayan Mehta | 01 May 1960 | 03 Mar 1962 |
Current Chief Minister of Gujarat – Bhupendrabhai Patel
Bhupendrabhai Patel is a member of the Bharatiya Janata Party (BJP). In addition to his job as a builder, Patel leads the standing committee of the Vishwa Umiya Foundation and is a trustee at Sardardham Vishwa Patidar Kendra. He adheres to the principles of Dada Bhagwan’s Akram Vignan Movement. Patel also plays badminton and cricket with great enthusiasm.
His political career began at municipal authorities in Ahmedabad. After, Vijay Rupani resigned as Gujarat’s chief minister on September 11, 2021 Patel was selected without a single protest to lead the BJP parliamentary party and become the next chief minister of Gujarat at a party conference in Gandhinagar on September 12, 2021. He formally took the oath to become Gujarat’s 17th Chief Minister.
A year later, the Bharatiya Janata Party achieved a record victory in the Gujarat Legislative Assembly Elections of 2022, winning 156 of the 182 seats. On December 12, 2022, Patel took the oath of office once more as Gujarat’s 18th Chief Minister. The administration headed by Bhupindrabhai Patel does not have a deputy chief minister.
Name of CM |
Bhupendrabhai Patel |
---|---|
Gujarat CM Contact Details |
|
Current Tenure |
13th September 202q – Present |
CM Of Gujarat Email ID |
cm@gujarat.gov.in |
CM Of Gujarat Helpline No. |
1070, 079-23251900 |
Gujarat CM Office Adress |
3rd floor New Sachivalay, Swarnim Sankul 1, Sector 10, Gandhinagar, Gujarat 382010 |
Official Website |
https://cmogujarat.gov.in/ |
- Date of Birth: 15th July 1962
- Place of Birth: Ahmedabad
- Education: Diploma in Civil Engineering (Government Polytechnic, Ahmedabad)
- Previous Political Positions: Member & President of Memnagar Nagarpalika, Vice Chairman of School Board of Amdavad Municipal Corporation (AMC), Chairman of the Ahmedabad Urban Development Authority (AUDA), Member of Gujarat Legislative Assembly, Leader of the House of Gujarat Legislative Assembly
Notable Chief Ministers of Gujarat
First Chief Minister of Gujarat
Jivraj Narayan Mehta was Gujarat’s first leader minister. He took office and started out serving as the Chief Minister on May 1, 1960, the day Gujarat have become its own state. Mehta changed into a famous doctor who finished his postgraduate research in London. He played a massive function inside the liberation movement and served as Mahatma Gandhi’s physician for a short time. His early-level management became critical in setting the stage for the political and economic improvement of Gujarat.
Longest Chief Ministers of Gujarat
Narendra Modi, who is presently the 14th Prime Minister of India, become the Chief Minister of Gujarat from 2001 to 2014. He took over the role because Keshubhai Patel changed into no longer properly. Modi has the longest time served as Gujarat’s Chief Minister. In 2014, when he became the Prime Minister, he left his position as the Chief Minister, and Anandiben Patel took over.
First Female Chief Minister of Gujarat
Anandiben Patel have become the primary girl Chief Minister of Gujarat, working from 2014 to 2016. Previously, she was the Education Minister in the BJP’s Cabinet from 2002 to 2007. On 1st August 2016, simply earlier than her 75th birthday, she introduced her stepping down because the Chief Minister. Currently, she is serving as the Governor of Uttar Pradesh.
Roles and Powers Chief Minister of Gujarat
The Chief Minister of a state in India, including Gujarat, holds significant powers and responsibilities. Here are some of the key powers and functions of the Chief Minister:
- Head of the Government: The Chief Minister is the head of the state government and is responsible for the overall administration of the state.
- Council of Ministers: The Chief Minister is responsible for appointing ministers to form the Council of Ministers. They assign portfolios to ministers and can reshuffle the cabinet as needed.
- Policy Formulation: The Chief Minister plays a crucial role in formulating policies and making decisions on various matters concerning the state. They often chair meetings with the cabinet to discuss and finalize policies.
- Legislation: The Chief Minister, along with the Council of Ministers, proposes and introduces bills in the state legislative assembly. They are actively involved in the legislative process.
FAQs on Chief Ministers of Gujarat –
1. Who is the 15th Chief Minister of Gujarat?
Anandiben Patel created history after becaming the first woman Chief Minister of Gujarat on 22 May 2014 and serving the state for two years. She was the 15th Chief Minister of Gujarat.
2. Who was the first Chief Minister of Gujarat?
Jivraj Narayan Mehta was Gujarat’s first chief minister. On 1st May 1960, the day Gujarat became a separate state, he assumed office and began working as the Cheif Minister.
3. How many times has Narendra Modi served as the Chief Minister of Gujrat?
Narendra Modi, who is currently the 14th Prime Minister of India, was the Chief Minister of Gujarat from 2001 to 2014. Modi has the longest time as Gujrat’s Chief Minister. He served the state for four terms from 7th October 2001 to 22nd May 2014.
4. Who succeeded Narendra Modi as the Chief Minister of Gujarat?
Narendra Modi was succeeded by Anandiben Patel who created history after becaming the first woman Chief Minister of Gujarat on 22 May 2014 and serving the state for two years.
5. Who is the current Chief Minister of Gujarat?
Bhupendrabhai Patel is the current Chief Minsiter of Gujarat He took his oath as the Chief Minister for the first time on 13th September. He took his second oath on 12 December 2022, making him the 18th Chief Minister of the state.